Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (THE FOUNTAIN)

Charity number: 1123770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £261.81k £225.24k £265.98k £214.24k £389.40k
Total expenditure £292.76k £242.79k £273.55k £251.33k £362.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.82k £19.29k N/A N/A