THE WOMANITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Womanity is an international organisation accelerating gender equality via investments in audacious, innovative, and sustainable solutions. We champion underexplored issues that catalyse the progress of marginalised women in some of the world's most challenging contexts including Afghanistan, Brazil, Cabo Verde, India, Lebanon, Mexico, South Africa and the MENA region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Afghanistan
- Brazil
- Cape Verde
- India
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Saudi Arabia
Governance
- 15 April 2008: Standard registration
- SMILING CHILDREN LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ranajoy Basu | Chair | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE OSTRO | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Yann Ghislain Borgstedt | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MS Ruth Szabo | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ziad Tabet | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Aastha Gurbax | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Pinon | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £130 | £0 | £5.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | £1.17k | £1.20k | £1.41k | £22.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ( PARTICULARLY FEMALES AND THE SOCIALLY AND /OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED) IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TEACHING FACILITIES, PERSONNEL AND TRAINING FROM PRIMARY THROUGH TO TERTIARY AND VOCATIONAL LEVELS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVER SEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Womanity Foundation
5 Elstree Gate
Elstree Way
Borehamwood
- Phone:
- 02082070602
- Email:
- pinonnatalie25@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window