Trustees BUILDING FUTURES EAST LIMITED
Charity number: 1125555

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew William Webster | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Louise Drabble | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Elizabeth Crabtree | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Evette Callender | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Barron | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stoner | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Alys Turnell | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE STEWART SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.