Addiction Family Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a not-for-profit social enterprise which provides support for families affected or bereaved by the consequences and outcomes resulting from a loved one's harmful use of alcohol, drugs, gambling and/or other substances. To also promote awareness about how to deal with the nightmare of substance misuse through education and awareness presentations to schools and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2008: Standard registration
- DRUGFAM (Previous name)
- DRUGFAM / THE NICHOLAS MILLS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE NICHOLAS MILLS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Savio D'Costa | Chair | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kate Power | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Grace Adams | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca King | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Pilcher | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hollins | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Clements | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Mills | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.18k | £233.58k | £237.24k | £509.82k | £371.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.71k | £228.58k | £284.92k | £351.40k | £421.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £7.50k | £7.50k | £7.50k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.68k | £54.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £209.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £299.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £225 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £285 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £311.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 31ST OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 02 May 2019 as amended on 28 May 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING CAUSED BY DRUG ABUSE BY MAKING HELP, SUPPORT AND ADVICE AVAILABLE TO THE FAMILIES, FRIENDS, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS OF DRUG USERS AND IN ADDITION TO GIVE SUPPLEMENTARY HELP TO DRUG USERS. 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN REGARD TO ADDICTION TO LICIT OR ILLICIT DRUGS INCLUDING ALCOHOL, SOLVENTS AND ANY OTHER PSYCHO-ACTIVE SUBSTANCE - PRESCRIBED OR OTHERWISE - AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakley Hall
8 Castle Street
High Wycombe
Buckinghamshire
HP13 6RF
- Phone:
- 08431225434
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window