DOLEN FFERMIO (FARMING LINK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support a goat breeding project and village goat improvement schemes in Uganda through advice, training, research and funding. To support the vocational training of vulnerable Ugandan young people through funding and supervision. To support environmental projects in Uganda and the UK. To promote awareness in the UK of world food and farming issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £4,962 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Uganda
Governance
- 27 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORNA ANNE BROWN | Chair | 06 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Gunnell | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rona Dorothy Gunnell | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lena Maren Fritsch | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kadun Lorcan Midwinter Rees | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin William Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
CORDELIA WEEDON | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY SMITH | Trustee | 09 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
EMYR OWEN | Trustee | 06 November 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.16k | £44.96k | £30.98k | £56.25k | £44.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.55k | £45.32k | £26.57k | £40.43k | £55.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.85k | £4.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2008 as amended on 29 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OR ANY OTHER AREA OF BENEFIT IDENTIFIED BY THE TRUSTEES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY BECOME SELF SUPPORTING AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (MAINLY IN MONTGOMERYSHIRE, POWYS AND SHROPSHIRE) IN WORLD FOOD AND FARMING ISSUES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRS L A BROWN
Ty'n-yr-Ardd
Church Street
LLANFYLLIN
SY22 5BA
- Phone:
- 01691 648709
- Email:
- hello@dolenffermio.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window