HULL KINGSTON ROVERS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WHAT WE DO USE FUN, SPORT AND ACTIVITY WITHIN COMMUNITIES TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EVERYONE; PROMOTING SELF-ESTEEM, RESPECT, ACHIEVEMENT, EMPLOYMENT, LEARNING AND A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE. HOW WE DO IT ? THROUGH LONG-TERM, SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITY PROGRAMMES ? WITH PROFESSIONAL, COMMITTED AND MOTIVATED STAFF AND PARTNERS ? SELF-FUNDED AND SUSTAINABLE ? IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income:
£534,185
Donations and legacies | £534.18k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£587,185
Raising funds | £341.62k | |
Charitable activities | £245.57k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,210 from 12 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £341.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £245.57k |
People

14 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 March 2008: Standard registration
- Hull KR Foundation (Working name)
- HULL KINGSTON ROVERS EDUCATION AND SPORT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Sainty | Chair | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Rooms | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Edward Flavell | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Graham Michael Turner | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Brett | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hull Kingston Rovers RLFC | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Harrison | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Wigglesworth | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Julia Lee | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £432.52k | £432.10k | £467.24k | £321.82k | £534.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £405.08k | £357.72k | £432.89k | £363.65k | £587.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £534.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £245.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £341.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £109.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS:- 3.1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE & HUMBERSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hull KR Foundation
Sewell Group Craven Park
Preston Road
HULL
HU9 5HE
- Phone:
- 01482 780901
- Email:
- community@hullkr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window