Financial history TRANSFORMING COMMUNITIES THROUGH KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS

Charity Number: 1123812
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.65k £18.95k £23.56k £21.76k £19.56k
Total expenditure £18.57k £19.10k £22.09k £23.47k £19.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A