MISSAO CRISTA VIDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
*Promote the Christian faith through weekly congregational worship and other appropriate means. *Develop a Newall Green community resource centre that will promote active engagement and informed citizenship. *Develop a variety of services in consultation with local residents addressing local needs. *Create opportunities for volunteering, paid employment and youth empowerment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Brazil
- Portugal
Governance
- 24 April 2008: Standard registration
- WORD OF LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM PAULO SIMOES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chimango Mhone | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Violent Mumba | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernadine Portbury | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIA SIMOES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KEITH BOULTER | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10k | £7.33k | £15.63k | £24.49k | £24.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42k | £9.47k | £17.21k | £21.54k | £21.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2023 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 21 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Shadowbrook Avenue
Newall Green
Manchester
M23 2BD
- Phone:
- 07590827675
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window