Financial history WAT SANTIWONGSARAM

Charity Number: 1123606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £152.06k £48.26k £127.80k £106.71k £114.52k
Total expenditure £75.86k £56.83k £56.41k £77.56k £102.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A