THE RESOLUTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants to charitable organisations/projects involving research/ education in economic and social sciences with a particular focus on the causes, prevention or relief of poverty. The Trust also makes grants to charitable organisations in fields other than education and research, & occasionally to individuals in charitable need to further the education of the individuals concerned.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Resolution Trust (Trustee) Limited | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £962.33k | £844.33k | £664.83k | £321.32k | £475.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.25m | £2.03m | £2.09m | £9.53m | £2.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.78k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £930.56k | £844.33k | £664.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.98m | £1.49m | £1.68m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £271.09k | £541.66k | £413.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.92k | £0 | £19.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £8.70m | £0 | £1.52m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £271.09k | £541.66k | £413.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST SETTLEMENT DATED 14 DECEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/01/2016
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Queen Annes Gate
London
SW1H 9AA
- Phone:
- 02033722960
- Email:
- info@resolutiontrust.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window