Financial history TRANSFORMATION LIFE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1123341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £51.67k £61.24k £83.01k £79.92k £81.04k
Total expenditure £68.96k £52.47k £70.25k £79.43k £77.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.30k £13.06k N/A N/A