WANTAGE SILVER BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wantage Silver Band is a charity dedicated to education in music and the art of playing brass band instruments to people of all ages through public performance of concerts, community events and competitions.The Band is dedicated to supporting the existence of Brass Bands through youth development and player education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Sizeland | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Coulson | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara-Jane Wallbridge | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL WYNE | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|||||
julia trinder | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Anderson | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN SYKES Bandmaster | Trustee |
|
||||||
LUCY VICTORIA SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN SYKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR ANNE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.64k | £51.82k | £258.95k | £101.93k | £143.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.30k | £39.46k | £67.87k | £90.54k | £101.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.81k | £10.10k | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MUSIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC AND TUITION IN THE SAME AND TO OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL DECIDE. (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WANTAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WANTAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Garston Close
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 7AH
- Phone:
- 07729014265
- Email:
- info@wantageband.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window