COUNCIL OF MOSQUES - TOWER HAMLETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Council of Mosques works primarily as a conduit of communication between the Muslim community in Tower Hamlets and the Local Authority is central. Currently, the Council of Mosques offers three main areas of service provision: 1. Capacity building and training programmes for its members and affiliates 2. Consultation and advocacy on local issues 3. Community cohesion activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,917 from 3 government contract(s) and £10,417 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 17 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAMSUL HOQUE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Mohammed Nurul Amin | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
FARUK AHMED | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Mowlana Mohammed Musleh Uddin | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammed Shamsul Hoque | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MUHAMMAD ALI | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Atik Miah | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
MASHUK AHMED | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Mafijur Rab | Trustee | 22 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMAD ABDUL MUNIM JAHEDI | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SIRAJUL ISLAM | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £30.76k | £19.79k | £16.07k | £76.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.98k | £15.74k | £22.67k | £11.91k | £35.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2008 AND 30 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL GROUPS; C) PROVIDING A CLOSER NETWORK AND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE MOSQUES AND OTHER ISLAMIC ORGANISATIONS WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND OTHER FAITH COMMUNITIES; D) PROVIDING ADVICE ON COMMUNITY ISSUES; E) BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH INDIVIDUALS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR RELIGION, ETHNIC ORIGIN OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO BRITISH SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) WORKING WITH INDIVIDUALS TO ADDRESS ISSUES OF INEQUALITY AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO BRITISH SOCIETY; B) WORKING WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS TO ENABLE THEM TO BETTER UNDERSTAND THE NEEDS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN ORDER THAT THEY CAN ADAPT SERVICE PROVISION TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY; C) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH WITH INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND DIFFERENT COMMUNITIES ON ISSUES PERTINENT TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY; D) RAISING THE CONCERNS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS OR AUTHORITIES AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES; E) BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF MOSQUES AND ISLAMIC ORGANISATIONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ADVICE & GUIDANCE, TRAINING AND OTHER MEANS SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO DELIVER PROJECTS AND SERVICES THAT ADDRESS ISSUES OF INEQUALITY; F) BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CoM-TH
3rd Floor
46 Whitechapel Road
London Muslim Centre
London
E1 1JX
- Phone:
- 02076503040
- Email:
- info@councilofmosques.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window