CHELMSFORD CHRISTIAN FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To plan, promote and organise public christian events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 18 April 2008: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £15.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309 | £19.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 29 May 2012 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 28 June 2011 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN CHELMSFORD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE HOLDING OF PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CHELMSFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window