NOTTINGHAM OUTLAWS AMATEUR RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nottingham Outlaws is a rugby league club in Nottingham which provides sporting activites for male and females from junior through to open age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 September 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALEX JAMES WHITTLE | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE PAGE | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOE SHEP | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.07k | £33.31k | £22.38k | £55.04k | £36.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.41k | £19.31k | £25.61k | £63.84k | £26.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO OFFER COACHING AND COMPETITIVE OPPORTUNITIES IN RUGBY LEAGUE. 2) TO PROMOTE THE CLUB WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND RUGBY LEAGUE. 3) TO MANAGE THE CLUB FACILITIES. 4) TO ENSURE A DUTY OF CARE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLUB. 5) TO PROVIDE ALL ITS SERVICES IN A WAY THAT IS FAIR TO EVERYONE. 6) TO ENSURE THAT ALL PRESENT AND FUTURE MEMBERS RECEIVE FAIR AND EQUAL TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
338 Musters Road
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7DF
- Phone:
- 07771880608
- Email:
- info@nottinghamrl.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window