WOOLTON IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOOLTON IN BLOOM CREATES AND MAINTAINS FLORAL PLANTERS AND HANGING BASKETS AND SUSTAINABLE PLANTING, WHICH CONSERVES WATER AND WILDLIFE HABITATS. THIS ENHANCES QUALITY OF LIVE IN WOOLTON, ATTRACTS VISITORS. ASSISTS THE ECONOMY. WOOLTON HAS WONBEST LARGE VILLAGE IN THE NORTH WEST 8 TIMES, A SILVER GILT AND 2 GOLD MEDALS IN THE NATIONAL BRITAIN IN BLOOM COMPETITION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivian Hicks | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES DAVIES | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
BARBARA MACE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ZILLAH MARY ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA COLLINGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £5.11k | £5.54k | £13.82k | £4.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.62k | £6.67k | £5.79k | £10.84k | £4.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT WOOLTON VILLAGE BY PROVIDING AND ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF DISPLAYS FLOWERS SHRUBS TREES AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE GENERAL ENHANCEMENT AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
WOOLTON VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 CHURCH ROAD
WOOLTON
LIVERPOOL
L25 6DB
- Phone:
- 01514282680
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
wooltoninbloom.wixsite.com/wooltoninbloom
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window