Financial history PLUS YOU LIMITED

Charity Number: 1125571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £595.96k £594.27k £520.54k £600.20k £416.64k
Total expenditure £587.26k £585.84k £467.55k £549.64k £563.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £156.46k £20.33k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.94k £1.94k £20.33k £544 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £429.83k £429.83k £349.17k £437.26k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £46.92k £45.24k £43.08k £57.92k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £117.23k £117.23k £107.94k £102.55k N/A
Income - Other £33 £33 £23 £1.94k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £245.42k £244.00k £213.17k £198.21k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.95k £4.20k £2.90k £2.65k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £341.85k £341.85k £254.38k £351.43k N/A