Trustees PLUS YOU LIMITED

Charity Number: 1125571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL AUSTIN WHITMORE Chair
None on record
RICHARD BURRELL Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
JEAN KING Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
NICOLA JUDITH GREEN Trustee 27 February 2017
None on record
Hadleigh Paul Gaudreau Trustee 27 June 2016
None on record
GARY RAYMOND KING Trustee 07 November 2011
None on record
CHRISTINE HOLLAND Trustee
None on record