SMR PHOENIX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate the Repair and Reuse Shop in South Molton. We supply local housing associations with quality affordable second hand goods for people setting up a home and stock everything from electricals to tableware bringing benefit to the local community. We also offer volunteering opportunities in customer service, retail and collection and delivery driving to local people within our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
- 26 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1129455 REFURNISH DEVON
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.23k | £270.32k | £285.49k | £285.93k | £253.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.20k | £315.71k | £316.41k | £285.65k | £261.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 04 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 04 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 13 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ; A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS, B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE GENERATION WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS. 3) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGH FIT INCLUDING EXISTENCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING TO GIVE NEW SKILLS TO PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED ON THE EMPLOYMENT MARKET.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window