Salisbury Hospice Charity Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial support for the Palliative Care Service based at Salisbury Hospice, and for the relief of suffering in cancer and other terminal illness and the promotion of related research. The aim of the charity is to contribute to the funding of a full range of palliative care services from Salisbury NHS Foundation Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,834,041
Donations and legacies | £2.13m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £587.60k | |
Investments | £120.72k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,090,909
Raising funds | £444.47k | |
Charitable activities | £1.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£155,976 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £444.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.65m | |
Retained for future use | £743.13k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £444.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.65m | |
Retained for future use | £899.11k |
People

13 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 March 2008: Standard registration
- 09 March 2019: Funds received from 282484 SALISBURY HOSPICECARE TRUST
- SALISBURY HOSPICE CHARITY (Working name)
- SALISBURY HOSPICE (Previous name)
- SALISBURY HOSPICECARE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter David Jenkins | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aloysia Mame Daros | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Whale | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lucy Goody | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Stewart Nielsen | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carl Timothy John Broadbridge | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Spicer | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK MERRILL | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|||||
STELLA VALENTINE MARGARET SYKES | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGH CHARLES PARDOE | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|||||
IAN PETER DOWNIE | Trustee | 10 February 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72m | £2.51m | £1.58m | £1.54m | £2.83m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70m | £1.41m | £1.70m | £1.93m | £2.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.05m | £1.98m | £1.02m | £904.09k | £2.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £573.32k | £439.37k | £470.68k | £519.52k | £587.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £91.81k | £87.33k | £94.16k | £115.00k | £120.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.74k | £2.03k | £1.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £562.67k | £1.29m | £318.21k | £330.51k | £1.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.32m | £1.11m | £1.38m | £1.49m | £1.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £374.93k | £300.71k | £316.73k | £441.20k | £444.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.02k | £18.13k | £6.74k | £10.59k | £11.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.24m | £1.01m | £1.29m | £1.40m | £1.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.22k | £5.13k | £5.77k | £5.68k | £6.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.07k | £0 | £3.47k | £1.65k | £3.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.78m | £2.14m | £2.69m | £2.38m | £2.55m | |
|
Other assets | £589.85k | £1.68m | £1.16m | £808.20k | £1.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £57.81k | £46.78k | £114.28k | £54.01k | £103.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 5TH MARCH 2008 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
3.1TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING(SO FAR AS SUCH PURPOSE IS CHARITABLE) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF SUCH OBJECT) 311BY ESTABLISHING MAINTAINING AND PROVIDING HOSPICE CARE AND HOME CARE SERVICES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX (WITHOUT REGARD TO RACE OR CREED) WHO ARE SUFFERING (AT ANY AGE) FROM ANY CHRONIC OR TERMINAL ILLNESS OR FROM ANY DISABILITY OR DISEASE ATTRIBUTABLE TO OLD AGE OR FROM ANY OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL INFIRMITY DISABILITY OR DISEASE AND BY PROVIDING MEDICAL OR OTHER TREATMENT AND ATTENTION FOR ANY SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID IN THEIR OWN HOMES 312 BY CONDUCTING OR PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS DISABILITY, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AS AFORESAID AND PARTICULARLY INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES 313BY PROVIDING BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING SERVICES FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CIRCUMSTANCES WHERE THE BEREAVEMENT CONCERNS A PATIENT TREATED BY THE CHARITY 314 BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN OR ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF SPIRITUAL HELP AND GUIDANCE FOR 3141 PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS DISABILITY DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AS AFORESAID WHETHER RECEIVING CARE AND/OR TREATMENT AT A HOSPICE RESIDENTIAL HOME OR IN THEIR OWN HOMES 3142 THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS AND 3143 THE CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS AND 315BY PROVIDING CARE SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO THE CARERS AND FAMILY OF PATIENTS TREATED BY THE CHARITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
IAN KEMP
FINANCE OFFICER
SALISBURY HOSPICE CHARITY
SALISBURY HOSPICE
ODSTOCK ROAD
SALISBUR
- Phone:
- 01722416353
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window