Financial history SHEPPERTON PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1126151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £177.53k £179.94k £174.08k £170.86k £241.64k
Total expenditure £153.51k £169.50k £194.98k £183.80k £255.31k
Income from government contracts £135.42k £130.38k £113.89k £126.72k £169.83k
Income from government grants £12.62k £2.11k N/A £4.88k £500