SHEPPERTON PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs Shepperton Pre-School, providing the Early Years Foundation stage curriculum to children particularly, but not exclusively, within the Shepperton Area. Shepperton Pre-School is registered with Ofsted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £169,827 from 1 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kenneth Leslie Venning | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Claire Louise Davis | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Palmer | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Lansdale | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jana Bulatovic | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Bosman | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Morris | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Morris | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.53k | £179.94k | £174.08k | £170.86k | £241.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.51k | £169.50k | £194.98k | £183.80k | £255.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £135.42k | £130.38k | £113.89k | £126.72k | £169.83k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.62k | £2.11k | N/A | £4.88k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRE SCHOOL EDUCATION TO ALL CHILDREN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE SHEPPERTON AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
165 Green Lane
Shepperton
TW17 8DY
- Phone:
- 01932240333
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window