Trustees SHEPPERTON PRE-SCHOOL LTD
Charity Number: 1126151

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kenneth Leslie Venning | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Claire Louise Davis | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Palmer | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Lansdale | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jana Bulatovic | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Bosman | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Morris | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Morris | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.