ARMY PARACHUTE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Subsidised sports parachuting for serving military, ex military (veterans) and sponsorship for ex servicemen wounded in battle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Anna Juliet Scott | Chair | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Richard Hill | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL Andrew Kennet CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIGADIER Phillip McEvoy OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY AND THE OTHER ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT FOR PARACHUTING AND SKY DIVING FOR MILITARY PERSONNEL FOR THE PURPOSE OF INCREASING THEIR PHYSICAL FITNESS, FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS AND TO FACILITATE TRAINING AND ADVENTURE TRAINING ACTIVITIES; 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF INCLUSIVE PARTICIPATION IN PARACHUTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND WHICH IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3. TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
APA
Airfield Camp
Netheravon
SALISBURY
SP4 9SF
- Phone:
- 01980670734
- Email:
- coo.apa@netheravon.com
- Website:
-
WWW.netheravon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window