WAYOUT - WORLDWIDE ARTS YOUTH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WAYout provides free access and training in music, fil, poetry and the arts to street and disadvantaged youth in Sierra Leone. Supporting young people to have their own voice about issues that concern them. We work in the prisons and run women's workshops in the provinces. we enable street youth into education and work and to be accepted back into their communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
- 10 May 2023: Funds received from 1159368 THE JOE STRUMMER FOUNDATION
- WAYOUT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS MCINERNY BA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Pletts | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harrison Coldray | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY ANTHONY MINTO | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL CHANDLER MBE MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.73k | £78.82k | £58.08k | £86.25k | £59.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.57k | £76.16k | £67.66k | £78.43k | £66.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 4 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 25
Newquay House
Sancroft Street
London
SE11 5UN
- Phone:
- 02070910162
- Email:
- info@wayoutarts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window