THE LOCKWOOD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants and donations to charities and individuals for general charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD LOCKWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr REBECCA KATHERINE LOCKWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY ANN LOCKWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.24k | £303.30k | £362.52k | £514.13k | £446.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £433.57k | £136.65k | £239.17k | £181.52k | £364.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £178.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £174.04k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH FUNDING SPECIFIC PROJECTS TO BENEFIT THE SICK AND TERMINALLY ILL 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT FOR SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES 3 TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF INSTITUTIONS SUCH AS MUSEUMS, LIBRARIES AND ART GALLERIES 4 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 5 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT PROVIDING THAT IN SO DOING THE CHARITY SHALL NOT RELIEVE ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY FROM ITS STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TITHE BARN
THE AVENUE
COMPTON
GUILDFORD
GU3 1JW
- Phone:
- 01483 415480
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window