VOICE FOR THE VOICELESS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide provide effective and free legal advice or other services to refugees and other immigrants. The advice covers immigration, welfare benefits, entitlements, housing benefits, paths to education, tailored training and mentoring young people and so on living within London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FERDINAND ILONGA BAKWA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL NTOCHUKWU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIMBENI MAFUTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £2.60k | £4.20k | £4.00k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £2.10k | £3.50k | £3.80k | £4.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN GREAT BRITAIN. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM. 5. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 6. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN GREAT BRITAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Danby House
68 Bruckner Street
London
W10 4EX
- Phone:
- 02089691731
- Email:
- voicevuk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window