The Care Collective De Cymru Limited

Charity number: 1123455

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Vision: The Care Collective wants to ensure unpaid carers are looking after themselves, enjoying their life and achieving their goals, whilst helping a family member or friend to receive empowering care or support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blaenau Gwent
  • Caerphilly
  • Cardiff
  • Merthyr Tydfil
  • Monmouthshire
  • Newport City
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff
  • Torfaen
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2008: Standard registration
  • 30 April 2019: Funds received from 1086698 CROSSROADS CARE CWM TAF
  • 03 October 2019: Funds received from 1124884 TORFAEN CARERS CENTRE
  • 27 July 2023: Funds received from 1090534 BRIDGEND COUNTY CROSSROADS, CARING FOR CARERS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Cariad Carers (Working name)
  • CROSSROADS CARE SOUTH EAST WALES (Working name)
  • GOFALU AM OFALWYR - CARING FOR CARERS (Working name)
  • The Care Collective (Working name)
  • CARERS TRUST SOUTH EAST WALES (Previous name)
  • CROESFFYRDD DE DDWRAIN CYMRU - CROSSROADS SOUTH EAST WALES (Previous name)
  • The Care Collective (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven John Harford Chair
None on record
Andrew Cooper Trustee 26 March 2020
HOSPICE OF THE VALLEYS
Received: On time
Michael Bobbett Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Gwenda Elizabeth Phillips Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
Gillian Dentus Trustee 17 March 2016
None on record
Richard Bevan Trustee
LATCH WELSH CHILDREN'S CANCER CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £2.77m £3.25m £4.50m £3.85m £3.36m
Total expenditure £2.51m £3.29m £4.03m £3.78m £3.73m
Income from government contracts £1.81m £2.44m £2.24m £1.65m £2.64m
Income from government grants £418.51k £373.41k £1.39m £1.20m £406.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £355.07k £5.41k £289.12k £26.50k £136.29k
Income - Other trading activities £138.14k £305.83k £354.26k £372.78k £75.90k
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.93m £3.86m £3.45m £3.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £122 £87 £42 £18 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £664 £267 £176
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.51m £3.29m £4.03m £3.78m £3.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £364.51k £479.14k £628.48k £493.03k £499.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £53.79k £75.48k £285.05k £319.70k £258.67k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £810.58k £1.07m £1.48m £1.51m £960.82k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £95.76k £268.00k £418.83k £418.03k £323.57k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BEGBIES TRAYNOR (CENTRAL) LLP
UNIT 16
COLUMBUS WALK
BRIGANTINE PLACE
CAERDYDD
CF10 4BY
Phone:
02920894270
Website:

No information available