Ganco Charitable Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting advancement of education and religion. Promoting racial and religious harmony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- India
- Malawi
- South Africa
Governance
- 04 April 2008: Standard registration
- THE NOWSAD GANI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOWSAD ABDUL GANI | Chair |
|
||||||||
Muhammed Sufiyan Gani | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
RUKSHANA GANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.18k | £186.71k | £376.00k | £207.20k | £116.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.07k | £194.49k | £379.64k | £168.07k | £155.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 18 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY IT FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 COMMONSIDE WEST
MITCHAM
CR4 4HA
- Phone:
- 02086874400
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window