FRIENDS OF INTI WARA YASSI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Inti Wara Yassi supports the work of the Communidad Inti Wara Yassi (CIWY) by raising funds and awareness of their work. CIWY is a Bolivian organisation created in defence of human and animal rights, and environmental justice. It manages three separate refuges for wild animals in different parts of the Bolivian Amazon and is devoted to the education of environmental awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Bolivia
Governance
- 05 June 2008: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF INTIWARA YASSI (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Cassidy | Chair | 04 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Laura Coleman | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matty Sowinski-Brown | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carola Rosa Gehring | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clara Salinas Pallares | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.61k | £115.04k | £151.04k | £177.63k | £118.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.38k | £91.06k | £153.42k | £162.66k | £147.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BOLIVIAN INTI WARA YASSI COMMUNITY, THAT IS TO SAY: 1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG BOLIVIAN PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECOLOGICAL ISSUES. 2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF WILD ANIMALS IN NEED OF CAE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE RUNNING AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE INTI WARA YASSI COMMUNITY'S WILD ANIMAL REFUGES IN BOLIVIA, WHERE ANIMALS AE RESCUED AND, WHERE POSSIBLE, REHABILITATED AND REINTRODUCED INTO THE WILD.
Area of benefit
BOLIVIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Gaston Way
SHEPPERTON
Surrey
TW17 8ET
- Phone:
- 07730985835
- Email:
- friends@intiwarayassi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window