THE JOHN SCOTT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations for youth work and veteran welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL JOHN WEMYSS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas William Monteith | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colonel John Muir Clavering | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Ian Scott | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW HENRY SCOTT | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.22k | £1.35m | £138.59k | £2.74m | £239.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.73k | £171.87k | £261.19k | £306.91k | £337.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.25m | N/A | £2.54m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £104.12k | N/A | £203.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £114.59k | N/A | £210.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £57.28k | N/A | £96.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £11.59k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £103.00k | N/A | £210.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £57.28k | N/A | £96.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG, YOUNG PEOPLE (BEING PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE UNDER 25) AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTION, THE SUPPORT OF YOUTH CLUBS AND SIMILAR BODIES PROMOTING THE RECREATION AND THE PERSONAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON AND IN AND AROUND GREENOCK AND WEMYSS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS GOODS AND SERVICES (B) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND ALLEVIATION OF HARDSHIP CAUSED BY INJURY ILLNESS OR POVERTY AMONG PRESENT OR FORMER MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
GREENOCK AND WEMYSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TORRIE HOUSE
NEWMILLS
DUMFERMLINE
KY12 8HH
- Phone:
- 01388881065
- Email:
- torrie@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window