INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (ICF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian Faith in the area of Birmingham, by providing a weekly place of christian worship; advance education in accordance to christian principles by conducting bible studies, christian education. Providing counselling services to persons in need or in hardship by the counsel of the scripture, and by praying for the sick. Providing charitable services in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Malaysia
- Philippines
Governance
- 07 April 2008: Standard registration
- FILIPINO INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (FICF) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROD RIVERA | Chair | 01 August 2007 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE BRIONES | Trustee | 25 February 2010 |
|
|
||||
REGIE GADAYAN | Trustee | 05 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNY LAMUG | Trustee | 05 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
MARIA ELENA VERA | Trustee | 01 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.13k | £76.60k | £58.69k | £69.42k | £73.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.32k | £63.07k | £70.52k | £67.04k | £73.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2010
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BIRMINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO BE NECESSARY. B TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN BIRMINGHAM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO BE NECESSARY. C TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN BIRMINGHAM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDED TO BE NECESSARY. D TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO BE NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLENSIDE ST.
WOODGATE VALLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B32 3RU
- Phone:
- 01214273216
- Email:
- icfbirmingham@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window