ZIMKIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving poverty:- emergency food, clothing, medical treatment; improving accommodation; personal support. Promoting self-sufficiency:- training in self-provision methods especially for food; resources; managing finance; practical skills. Enhancing life:- finance, materials & instruction for school and F.E.; inspiring hope; recreation; teaching values for living; teaching Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Koral | Trustee | 20 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ruvimbo Nyamajiyah | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tendai Horton | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelica Udeze | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elisabeth Carta Samuel | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Johnstone | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Leech | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.51k | £77.62k | £80.04k | £93.72k | £79.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.93k | £83.94k | £77.87k | £92.76k | £94.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2017 as amended on 16 Apr 2021 as amended on 24 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1. RELIEVING POVERTY: TO PROVIDE EMERGENCY SUPPORT, FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER AND MEDICAL HELP, FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN TIMES OF CRISIS. 2. PROMOTING SELF-SUFFICIENCY: TO GIVE ADVICE AND TRAINING IN VARIOUS METHODS OF SELF-SUFFICIENCY TO ENSURE A MORE POSITIVE FUTURE FOR VULNERABLE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES. 3. ENHANCING LIFE: TO IMPROVE THE LIFE-CHANCES OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN NEED BY GIVING EMOTIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT, TEACHING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND PROVIDING RESOURCES TO ASSIST PARTICIPATION IN SCHOOLING AND FURTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
ZIMBABWE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZIMKIDS
MORDEN BAPTIST CHURCH
CROWN LANE
MORDEN
SM4 5BL
- Phone:
- 07906320950
- Email:
- zimkids.charity@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window