RECYKE Y'BIKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RyB's core activity is refurbishing bicycles, donated largely by the public, by a team of enthusiastic volunteers and paid mechanics. Some are sold to raise funds, others are given away as community referral bikes. Suitable bikes and spares are sent to projects in Africa where local mechanics refurbish them for sale to people in need. We also train people in cycling and bike maintenance skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £11,659 from 8 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 21 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan James Thompson | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Donat Nicholls | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Alexander Kontarines | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ZOE HODGSON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Robert Hunter | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Archer | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Newson | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Priestley-Leach | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £426.04k | £324.52k | £388.40k | £359.22k | £393.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £355.26k | £313.33k | £367.85k | £345.48k | £417.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.32k | £14.38k | £5.05k | £6.06k | £11.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 MAY 2008 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY 2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING CYCLING. 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL AGES OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SAFE USE, RE-USE AND MAINTENANCE OF BICYCLES 4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SAVING BICYCLES FROM LANDFILL, THE PROMOTION OF BICYCLE RE-USE AND RECYCLING.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lauran House
164 Brinkburn Street
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 2AR
- Phone:
- 01912654197
- Email:
- jack@recyke.bike
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window