THE CHRISTOPHER MOYES MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of hardship, to help children, families, the elderly and people who are sick or have disabilities that are in need of financial assistance. Assistance of education to assist in the provision of education by way of financial support towards provision of education to individuals, donations to educational institutes, or donations to charities that assist with the provision of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 07 April 2008: Standard registration
- THE PREBEND TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ROSALAND MOYES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Abigail Lucy Theresa Holt | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RONA FELLOWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor GRAHAM JOHN KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.91k | £113.70k | £55.66k | £127.02k | £162.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.69k | £121.15k | £102.37k | £85.31k | £110.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 9 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 12 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING. 2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME FO THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, DURHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clive Owen & Co
140 Coniscliffe Road
Darlington
DL3 7RT
- Phone:
- 01325349700
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window