CRANHAM COMMON TRUST

Charity Number: 1123525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's objectives are to raise funds to purchase the open common land in Cranham (some 70acres).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,189
Total expenditure: £765

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Louise Daniels Trustee 23 March 2024
None on record
Phillipa Rose Mackie Saunders Trustee 23 March 2024
None on record
Laura Anne Chilcott Trustee 23 March 2024
None on record
Richard Harry Ian Overs Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
TIMOTHY WILLIAM OSBORNE Trustee 02 November 2017
LIFTING THE BLUES
Received: On time
Peter John Elliott Trustee 06 February 2017
None on record
Michael James Drake Trustee 08 October 2016
None on record
Peter Rushbrooke Bass Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record
Richard Theodore Tyson Trustee 20 September 2014
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIO
Received: On time
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, GLOUCESTERSHIRE BRANCH
Received: On time
Beryl Dorothy Berry Trustee 19 September 2009
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.23k £4.32k £2.11k £2.13k £2.19k
Total expenditure £1.13k £1.01k £946 £2.73k £765
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Wiggin Osborne Fullerlove
95 Promenade
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 1HH
Phone:
01242 710206
Website:

No information available