Trustees ROSE HILL AND DONNINGTON ADVICE CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1123488

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanna Rose Drohan | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Gaye Pullen | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Linda Stewart | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Ann Elphinstone | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Marie Lawhead | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nasreen Hussain | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Shereen Karmali | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WAREING | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GEORGINA TANNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.