DARUL ULOOM KANTHARIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the physical and mental health of children and orphans in India in particular Darul Uloom Kantharia Gujarat, India and across India through the provision of financial assistance, support education, accommodation, food and medical care and to work towards relief of financial need and suffering amongst victims of natural disasters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 05 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDULLAH HAJI VALLIBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|||||
MOHMED HANIF SUFI | Trustee |
|
||||||
TALHA SANAULLAH AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUS SAMAD ISMAIL AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.88k | £175.98k | £88.83k | £129.28k | £204.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.90k | £40.93k | £53.71k | £186.40k | £231.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 25 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND ORPHANS IN INDIA PARTICULARLY, DARUL ULOOM ULOOM KANTHARIA, MAHMOOD NAGAR, PO KANTHARIA, DIST BHARUCH, GUJARAT, INDIA 392162 THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, ACCOMMODATION, FOOD AND MEDICAL TREATMENT. 2 TO PROMOTE, FURTHER OR SUPPORT ANY SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH A MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID).
Area of benefit
INDIA PARTICULARLY, DARUL ULOOM ULOOM KANTHARIA, MAHMOOD NAGAR, PO KANTHARIA, DIST BHARUCH, GUJARAT, INDIA 392162
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 MOSS STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 5HW
- Phone:
- 01254668030
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window