WARWICKSHIRE COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to the Voluntary, Community and Social Enterprise Organisations through Funding and Governance advice and support , Training , Community development . Strong representation, Group support and development . Campaigning and promotion, Volunteer recruitment and good practice in Volunteer management, Direct delivery projects include Social Prescribing, Youth Employment and two Big Local areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,539,047
Donations and legacies | £4.02k | |
Charitable activities | £1.43m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £108.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,620,636
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.62m | |
Other | £0 |
£192 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £777,715 from 4 government contract(s) and £316,706 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.62m |
People

42 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- CAVA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Spiers | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Querelle | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Weir-Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janinah Elisha McKenzie | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Wildig | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cheryll Rawbone | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Arnold Gabbitas | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14m | £1.39m | £1.30m | £1.55m | £1.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37m | £1.31m | £1.43m | £1.42m | £1.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £413.18k | £599.77k | £618.35k | £605.64k | £777.72k | |
|
Income from government grants | £198.54k | £199.29k | £201.29k | £288.96k | £316.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.98k | £2.36k | £963 | £1.82k | £4.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £1.32m | £1.22m | £1.43m | £1.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £99.21k | £67.28k | £85.48k | £117.67k | £108.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.37m | £1.31m | £1.43m | £1.42m | £1.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.37k | £5.38k | £5.70k | £7.27k | £8.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £98.39k | £52.34k | £50.19k | £154.55k | £188.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £458.21k | £444.30k | £472.04k | £520.54k | £518.06k | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.52k | £15.68k | £16.45k | £16.41k | £16.21k | |
|
Other assets | £813.08k | £839.38k | £812.85k | £835.39k | £670.15k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £295.27k | £232.65k | £361.69k | £308.61k | £222.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 2008. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE 'OBJECTS') ARE WITHIN THE MIDLAND AREA AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE BOROUGHS OF NORTH WARWICKSHIRE, RUGBY AND NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS, AND THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF WARWICK AND STRATFORD ON AVON AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"") 3.1 TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; 3.2 WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING TO PROVIDE RESOURCES TO INCLUDE NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION ADVICE, GUIDANCE, MENTORING, TRAINING, SUPERVISION AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THESE ORGANISATIONS WITH THEIR CHARITABLE WORK; AND 3.3 TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THESE PURPOSES AND TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH SEPARATE LOCAL MEMBERS COMMITTEE MEETINGS FOR EACH OF THE BOROUGHS OF NORTH WARWICKSHIRE, RUGBY AND NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH, AND THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF WARWICK AND STRATFORD ON AVON.
Area of benefit
THE MIDLANDS AREA, PARTICULARLY THE BOROUGHS OF NORTH WARWICKSHIRE, RUGBY AND NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH, AND LGDS OF WARWICK AND STRATFORD ON AVON AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WCAVA
4-6 Clemens Street
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV31 2DL
- Phone:
- 01788574258
- Email:
- information@wcava.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window