THE KUFLINK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives and Activities To support community focused projects for the youth, the advancement of education (particularly in Gravesend and the surrounding area of Kent and Greater London), the advancement of amateur sport (particularly in Gravesend and the surrounding area of Kent and Greater London), the advancement of health or the saving of lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 June 2008: Standard registration
- THE ALPHA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rawinder Binning | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Molly Hepburn | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
TEJWANT SINGH CHATTHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJDEEP KAUR CHATTHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.83k | £14.62k | £21.67k | £19 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.82k | £13.97k | £12.55k | £14.20k | £5.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 December 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 December 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE (PARTICULARLY IN GRAVESEND AND THE SURROUNDING REGIONS OF KENT AND GREATER LONDON) THROUGH: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2). THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT (PARTICULARLY, IN GRAVESEND AND THE SURROUNDING REGIONS OF KENT AND GREATER LONDON); (3) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS (PARTICULARLY IN GRAVESEND AND THE SURROUNDING REGIONS OF KENT AND GREATER LONDON) WHO ARE ADDICTED OR AT RISK OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO, OR WHO ARE DEPENDENT UPON, ILLEGAL DRUGS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTANCE MISUSE.
Area of benefit
GRAVESEND AND THE SURROUNDING REGIONS OF KENT AND GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ALPHA FOUNDATION
21 WEST STREET
GRAVESEND
DA11 0BF
- Phone:
- 01474334499
- Email:
- min.binning@kuflink.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window