THE SAGA RESPITE FOR CARERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open to all UK residents. Priority will be given to unpaid carers over 50 who have had caring responsibilities for longer than 12 months and not taken a holiday away from those responsibilities within the last year. Beneficiaries will receive a holiday for two (the second person ought to be over 40) plus appropriate spending money and, if required the payment of professional substitute care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 June 2008: Standard registration
- 12 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.03k | £48.20k | £75.56k | £48.78k | £33.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.00k | £83.29k | £109.60k | £116.76k | £91.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 14 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | 18 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 25 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 25 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 09 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | 09 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE CURRENTLY OR WERE FORMERLY CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME (CARERS ) BY OFFERING RESPITE TO CARERS, PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SHORT BREAKS, HOLIDAYS AND OCEAN AND RIVER CRUISES ( ALL OF WHICH MAY BE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD ) AND ALSO BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH OTHER SIMILAR OR ANCILLARY AMENITIES AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE TO ACHIEVE THE AIM OF PROVIDING RESPITE TO CARERS. OTHER PERSONS MAY BE INCLUDED AS RECIPIENTS OF BENEFITS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE TO ACHIEVE THE AIM OF PROVIDING RESPITE TO CARERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window