Financial history THE O'SULLIVAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1123757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £238.50k £183.46k £146.09k £134.81k £105.68k
Total expenditure £345.31k £363.50k £357.85k £497.32k £490.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A