Great Beauty Tabernacle

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORSHIP SERVICES. LOCAL COMMUNITY PROJECTS AND COMMUNITY-FOCUSED EVENTS. PROVISION OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 April 2008: Standard registration
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) GREAT BEAUTY TABERNACLE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Olajide Samuel Oluwasanmi | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Adeola Ade-onojobi | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ayo Johnson Emmanuel | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH IWOLODE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH OLUREMI FAJUYIGBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.98k | £97.34k | £99.87k | £113.82k | £112.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.45k | £81.89k | £97.42k | £89.38k | £91.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 2008. as amended on 31 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 BIRKHALL ROAD
LONDON
SE6 1TF
- Phone:
- 02086987661
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window