International Sleep Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is run by volunteers to improve sleep outcomes for free. The main activities are: 1) Improved sleep education by webinars and podcasts from world experts. 2) Free use of sleep improvement services/goods to specific groups 3) Fast, objective, cost-effective sleep equipment testing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Iceland
- United States
Governance
- 17 April 2008: Standard registration
- EXPRESS YOURSELF TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suleyman Nordeen | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yizhou Yu | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHARLIE OULTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £23.70k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £7.70k | £1.38k | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 February 2025 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2025 | 829 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MARCH 2008 as amended on 24 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o SleepHubs Ltd
Shedfield House Dairy
Sandy Lane
Shedfield
Southampton
SO32 2HQ
- Phone:
- 03330033352
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window