Accounts and annual returns THE WAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 January 2020 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required