Financial history TOTTERIDGE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1123743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £283.32k £143.90k £212.59k £306.80k £405.62k
Total expenditure £282.99k £131.51k £216.56k £271.81k £390.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £80.67k £16.17k N/A N/A