DERBY COUNTY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1123520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Use the Power of Derby County Football Club to improve lives and communities through health, education, physical activity and sport.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 2008: Standard registration
  • 28 February 2019: Funds received from 1041422 SPORTING FUTURES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DERBY COUNTY IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEAN NATHAN JACKSON Trustee 07 August 2024
BE MORE BAILEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ENTHUSIASM TRUST
Received: On time
Dawn Marie Spendlove Trustee 07 August 2024
None on record
Michael Scott Evans Trustee 07 August 2024
None on record
Richard Mark Gerver Trustee 07 August 2024
None on record
Rachel Susan Morris Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Baljinder Singh Atwal Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Paul Raymond Roberts Trustee 26 February 2020
None on record
Phillip Ellis Trustee 13 December 2017
None on record
Stephen Anthony Pearce Trustee 19 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.28m £2.54m £3.60m £3.34m £3.87m
Total expenditure £3.01m £2.46m £3.20m £3.40m £4.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £781.46k
Income from government grants £693.22k £784.46k £719.31k £601.12k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £87.78k £112.78k £0 £0 £70.93k
Income - Other trading activities £115.86k £11.99k £326.10k £121.58k £332.57k
Income - Charitable activities £3.07m £2.42m £3.27m £3.22m £3.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £71.43k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £112.78k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.92m £2.40m £2.91m £3.28m £3.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £90.50k £61.36k £288.92k £111.53k £190.57k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £627.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £58.64k £39.94k £25.96k £26.70k £24.13k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.61m £1.82m £2.18m £2.04m £2.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 -£263.00k £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £641.74k £725.52k £647.18k £564.47k £609.13k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 May 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 14 May 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Derby County Community Trust
14 Pride Point Drive
Pride Park
DERBY
DE24 8BX
Phone:
01332416140