THE HACKNEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hackney Society organises events, produces publications & a regular newsletter, SPACES, to highlight the society's work, campaigns to protect local buildings of historical and/or architectural merit, promotes high standards of design, construction and conservation, and provide advice and support to local groups to help them improve their neighbourhoods
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hackney
Governance
- 17 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Chapman | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Abigail Christine Winslow | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Scott Briggs | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon John Shrigley | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Schick | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Skivington | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Christine Lafferty | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.14k | £10.82k | £8.02k | £10.75k | £18.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.94k | £5.21k | £5.72k | £5.27k | £5.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE BROADLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND MORE SPECIFICALLY: (I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, ARCHITECTURE AND CONSERVATION IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (II) TO EDUCATE AND FOSTER PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1D GLENARM ROAD
LONDON
E5 0LY
- Phone:
- 07773440444
- Email:
- info@hackneysociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window