DORSET STORM BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Basketball - Playing opportunities. Coaching and officiating courses. Community basketball coach available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL KEMISH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANTHONY RUDENKO | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADAM CRAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUKE KEMISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.47k | £11.64k | £21.17k | £21.03k | £24.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.29k | £11.11k | £20.97k | £20.99k | £23.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 May 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION OF PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF BASKETBALL. 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR FOR NEW AND EXPERIENCED BASKETBALL COACHES, REFEREES AND TABLE OFFICIALS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Hadrian Close
West Parley
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 8RQ
- Phone:
- 01202870783
- Email:
- info@dorsetstorm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window