Financial history JOY OF SOUND (JOS)

Charity number: 1126361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.89k £44.79k £17.14k £44.77k £35.95k
Total expenditure £31.53k £34.09k £25.54k £22.22k £40.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £9.74k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.85k N/A £9.74k £9.74k